Kroll, Michael Marc (CPSO#: 51002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Family Health Team
Suite 105
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3852
Fax: (905) 813-3853
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-4466
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Temins & Kroll Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Temins ( CPSO# 56883 )
Dr. M. Kroll ( CPSO# 51002 )

Business Address:
Suite 320
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2Y1
Phone Number: (905) 826-6013

Business Address:
Suite 105
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 813-3852

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MARC KROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROLL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1984