Kruczynski, Krystyna Helen (CPSO#: 56795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough, On M1W 3W3
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kruczynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kruczynski ( CPSO# 56795 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA HELEN KRUCZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUCZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1987