Kruger, Paul Christopher (CPSO#: 110241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 21 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 923-0285
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 9059230285
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL CHRISTOPHER KRUGER may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KRUGER is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. KRUGER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KRUGER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KRUGER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KRUGER ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. KRUGER ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018