Kruger, Phil (CPSO#: 86879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of the Orange Free State, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2431
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phil Kruger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kruger ( CPSO# 86879 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHIL KRUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2012