Kubba, Hayder Salem Hatem (CPSO#: 85795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4
Phone: (905) 279-1700
Fax: (905) 897-9167
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hayder S. Kubba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kubba ( CPSO# 85795 )

Business Address:
Dixie Road Medical Associates
2200 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1Z4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAYDER SALEM HATEM KUBBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUBBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2008