Kucher, Brandon Matthew (CPSO#: 87015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
669 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A6
Phone: (705) 575-9822
Fax: (705) 575-9823
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kucher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kucher ( CPSO# 87015 )

Business Address:
669 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A6
Phone Number: (705) 575-9822

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDON MATTHEW KUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2010 to 26 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012