Kuhlmann, Emily Thelma (CPSO#: 96895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: 416 391 6119
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
4th Floor
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-1100
Fax: 905-813-4024
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kuhlmann ( CPSO# 96895 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Toronto ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone Number: (416) 622-0933

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY THELMA KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013