Kuhnert, Peter Eric (CPSO#: 77863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Specialized Mental Health Freeport
Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7041
Fax: (519) 894-8308
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Delton Glebe Centre
177 Albert St.
Waterloo ON  N2L 3T4
Canada
Phone: 519-884-3305
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kuhnert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kuhnert ( CPSO# 77863 )

Business Address:
177 Albert Street
Waterloo ON  N2L 3T4
Phone Number: (519) 884-3305

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital - Freeport Site
Specialized Mental Health Freeport
3750 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Guyana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ERIC KUHNERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHNERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2002