Kumanovskiy, Svyatoslav (CPSO#: 113482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  06 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Crimean State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 West Street
Suite 204A
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Svyatoslav Kumanovskiy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kumanovskiy ( CPSO# 113482)

Business Address:
216 West Street
Suite 204A
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 426-9191

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital & Norfolk Hospital Nursin
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Svyatoslav  Kumanovskiy  may  practise internal medicine at 216 West
                  Street, Norfolk General Hospital and  Norfolk  Hospital  Nursing  Home in
                  Simcoe,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision  coordinated by a supervisor
                  acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires  eighteen  months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of  registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration  Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the  College  of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Kumanovskiy's  knowledge, skill, judgment  or  attitude,  does  not
                        provide the required  reports  to the College by the due date or if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Kumanovskiy's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment  report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Kumanovskiy's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 7, 2017,  and will expire on or before
                  January 6, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.