Kumar, Rajat (CPSO#: 79227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Oct 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar ( CPSO# 79227 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue, 700U
Suite 6-701
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2308

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 16 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJAT KUMAR may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. KUMAR holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. KUMAR may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. KUMAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is 30 Oct 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 May 2003 to 01 Aug 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2003 to 04 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018