Kumar, Rishi (CPSO#: 102325)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Nova Southeastern University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V1R8
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 32362
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr.
Brampton ON  L6R3J7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar ( CPSO# 102325)

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 05 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Rishi Kumar may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.