Kumar, Rohini (CPSO#: 93595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
723 Rymal Wt West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: 905-574-7300
Fax: 905-574-2283
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Canada
Phone: 905-574-7300
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rohini Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar ( CPSO# 93595 )

Business Address:
155 James Street South
Unit 200
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 528-8747

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROHINI KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012