Kumar, Vikaash Naveen Chandra (CPSO#: 85216)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite 306
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: 905-472-7072
Fax: 905-472-0529
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2260
Fax: 416-946-6546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikaash N.C. Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kumar ( CPSO# 85216 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite 306
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7072

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAASH NAVEEN CHANDRA KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010