Kung, Elizabeth Yi Lee (CPSO#: 83895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Monash University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6876
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elizabeth Kung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kung ( CPSO# 83895 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6876

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH YI LEE KUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 24 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007