Kungurov, Maria (CPSO#: 79244)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McGill University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Kungurov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Aug 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2003 to 27 Jul 2003
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016