Kuo, Eugene E-Ching (CPSO#: 66467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. 1210
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kuo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kuo ( CPSO# 66467 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE E-CHING KUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995