Kuo, Kevin Hsin-Mu (CPSO#: 82448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Kuo, Kevin (used until: 04 Jul 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Div of Haematology Room 8N 883
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5233
Fax: (416) 340-3799
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Kuo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kuo ( CPSO# 82448 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room 8 N 883
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN HSIN-MU KUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010