Kupsh, Christine Claire (CPSO#: 66832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1995


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 2C6
Phone: (705) 662-7133
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4790
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CLAIRE KUPSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1995