Kurian, Susan Saina (CPSO#: 80515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-2048
Fax: (613) 623-6719
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Kurian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurian ( CPSO# 80515 )

Business Address:
Suite 257
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-2048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN SAINA KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2004 to 23 May 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 May 2004 to 28 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2005