Kurup, Asha (CPSO#: 68740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Singapore, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 218
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 332-8128
Fax: (416) 332-9961
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asha Kurup Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kurup ( CPSO# 68740 )

Business Address:
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 218
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 332-8128

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA KURUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999