Kuruvilla, John George (CPSO#: 72717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 6-424
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone: (416) 946-2821
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuruvilla ( CPSO# 72717 )

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Room 6-424
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 946-2821

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2003