Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kushner, Arthur Michael (CPSO#: 23590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone: (416) 247-2193
Fax: (416) 247-0402
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kushner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kushner ( CPSO# 23590 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
245 Dixon Road
Etobicoke ON  M9P 2M4
Phone Number: (416) 247-2193

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR MICHAEL KUSHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUSHNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1971