Kwan, Bartholomew Ping (CPSO#: 68972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58217
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kwan ( CPSO# 68972 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARTHOLOMEW PING KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2001