Kwok, Bruce Chia-Wah (CPSO#: 80687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre At 80 Bond
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone: (416) 864-3011
Fax: (416) 864-3099
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bruce Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kwok ( CPSO# 80687 )

Business Address:
80 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1X2
Phone Number: (416) 864-3011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE CHIA-WAH KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2006