Kwok, Koon Leung (CPSO#: 51010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1W8
Phone: (416) 494-2001
Fax: (416) 494-2004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kwok ( CPSO# 51010 )

Business Address:
209 - 2175 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2J 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2001

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KOON LEUNG KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1985