Kwon, Janice Smith (CPSO#: 67898)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: Kwon, Janice Sugie (used until: 13 Feb 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janice Kwon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2007