Kyanzadeh, Fareiborz (CPSO#: 87656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
World On Yonge Medical Centre
Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kyanzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Kyanzadeh ( CPSO# 87656 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 0C4
Phone Number: (905) 597-5919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAREIBORZ KYANZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYANZADEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2010