Kyes, John Henry (CPSO#: 21578)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 28 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Kyes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kyes ( CPSO# 21578 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-6970

Business Address:
104 - 36 Vodden Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 455-5455

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1968
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 28 Dec 2017