Kyone, Soe Lwin (CPSO#: 70359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Soe Lwin Kyone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kyone ( CPSO# 70359 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Department of Radiology
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Oakdale Radiology & Ultrasound Associates
B-1 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7

Business Address:
Dixie X-Ray Associates Limited
201 & 203 - 3461 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3X4

Business Address:
Dixie X-Ray Associates Limited
103 - 1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9

Business Address:
Dixie X-Ray Associates Limited
City Centre X-Ray and Ultrasound
205 - 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Phone Number: (905) 270-5933

Business Address:
Dixie X-Ray Associates Limited
Columbus Medical Arts Building
4B - 8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (905) 850-7478

Business Address:
Agincourt Professional Centre
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 402
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 756-7667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOE LWIN KYONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001