Kyrollos, Adel George Halim (CPSO#: 65936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
RIVERVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
2817 RIVERSIDE DRIVE
Fax: 613-443-0440
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone: 613-789-1011
Fax: 844-666-2491
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V4
Canada
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1887 St Joseph BLVD
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Canada
Phone: (613) 903-7563
Fax: (613)903-7564
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1370 Clyde Avenue Suite 203
Ottawa ON  K2G 3H8
Canada
Phone: (613) 224-2258
Fax: (613) 224-4519
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adel Kyrollos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kyrollos ( CPSO# 65936 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Center
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 789-1011

Business Address:
1887 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
USA - Michigan
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADEL GEORGE HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2001