La Mere, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 54135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6444 Ext. 4071
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 635-2550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth LaMere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. La Mere ( CPSO# 54135 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6289

Business Address:
North York General Hospital - Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Business Address:
111 Burbank Drive
Toronto ON  M2K 1N6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE LA MERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LA MERE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1987