Labelle, Guy Victor (CPSO#: 77468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
172 Ethel Street, suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone: (705) 753-6319
Fax: (705) 580-2292
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Labelle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Labelle ( CPSO# 77468 )

Business Address:
172 Ethel Street
Suite 2B
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 1V9
Phone Number: (705) 753-6725

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients can send any requests for medical records to: 172 Ethel Street Box 42 Sturgeon Falls, ON P2B 1V9
Date Received: 11 Jan 2012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 18, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 18, 2018, West Nipissing General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that the privileges held by Dr. Guy Victor Labelle at West Nipissing General Hospital were suspended, effective from 4:00 pm, January 18, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GUY VICTOR LABELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004