Labonte, Roger Edmond (CPSO#: 43029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
1500 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B8
Phone: (705) 522-7346
Fax: (705) 523-6806
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
P3E 5J1
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol St
Sturgeon Falls, ON
P2B 2Y6
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-3131
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Labonte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Labonte ( CPSO# 43029 )

Business Address:
2 - 1500 Paris Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3B8
Phone Number: (705) 522-7346

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER EDMOND LABONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987