Lacasse, Marie Lynn (CPSO#: 79582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Englehart District Hospital
Box 69
61 5th Street
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone: (705) 544-2301
Fax: (705) 544-5224
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marie Lynn Lacasse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lacasse ( CPSO# 79582 )

Business Address:
61 5th Street
Box 69
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 544-2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE LYNN LACASSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACASSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2007