Lackner, Colin Roberts (CPSO#: 69973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services -
Owen Sound
PO Box 1800
8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2029
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colin Lackner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lackner ( CPSO# 69973 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
Owen Sound
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN ROBERTS LACKNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LACKNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1999