Laffey, John Gerard (CPSO#: 72835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Mar 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Laffey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laffey ( CPSO# 72835 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. John Gerard Laffey may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Laffey holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration expires when Dr. Laffey no longer holds
                  the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1.