Lafleche, Claire Marie (CPSO#: 45129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Montreal Road
Suite 306
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 744-3236
Fax: (613) 744-5624
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheshko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sheshko ( CPSO# 61838 )
Dr. C. Lafleche ( CPSO# 45129 )

Business Address:
306 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 744-7295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE MARIE LAFLECHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFLECHE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1989