Laforte, Anne Rosemary (CPSO#: 51112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: La Forte-Clarke, Anne Rosemary (used until: 06 Sep 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B
373 Vidal Street South
Sarnia ON  N7T 2V3
Phone: (519) 332-1117
Fax: (519) 332-1119
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: La Forte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Laforte ( CPSO# 51112 )

Business Address:
440 Lydia Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6P6

Business Address:
Suite B
373 Vidal Street South
Sarnia ON  N7T 2V3
Phone Number: (519) 332-1117

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY LAFORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFORTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1985