Laforty, Jack Morris (CPSO#: 63958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville Mental Health Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 345-1461
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

precision medical centre
613-104 Longfields Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J6J2
Canada
Phone: 613-762-7005
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

P O Box 58
4319 Cove Road
Portland ON  K0G 1V0
Canada
Phone: (613) 272-3024
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Brockville Jail
25 Central Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 3Y2
Canada
Phone: (613) 341-2870 Ext. 3230
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laforty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Laforty ( CPSO# 63958 )

Business Address:
Brockville Mental Health Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone Number: (613) 345-1461

Business Address:
Brockville City Jail
10 Wall Street
Brockville ON  K6V 4R9
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
St Vincent de Paul Hospital,Providence Continuing Care Centre Brockville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACK MORRIS LAFORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFORTY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1992