Lafrance, Elise (CPSO#: 57422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
818 Maloney east boul
Gatineau QC  J8P 1G8
Phone: (819) 643-3566
Fax: (819) 643-3767
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 carling avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4418
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISE LAFRANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRANCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Jul 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1990