Lagrotteria, David Marc (CPSO#: 86792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health System
St.Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45561
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Lagrotteria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Lagrotteria ( CPSO# 86792 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARC LAGROTTERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGROTTERIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012