Lagrotteria, Leda (CPSO#: 56934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: Cipolla, Leda (used until: 07 Mar 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 800
723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone: (905) 574-1115
Fax: (905) 574-2283
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leda Lagrotteria Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lagrotteria ( CPSO# 56934 )

Business Address:
800 - 723 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 574-1115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEDA LAGROTTERIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAGROTTERIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988