Lai Fatt, Peter Hernando (CPSO#: 51114)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.H. Lai Fatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lai Fatt ( CPSO# 51114 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa, ON L1H 1B9
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 18 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018