Lai, Stephen I-Hsiang (CPSO#: 67880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Royal Orchard Boulevard
Basement Unit 101
Thornhill ON  L3T 3C3
Phone: (905) 771-7600
Fax: (905) 771-9600
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit #6, 375 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V1A3
Canada
Phone: 905-509-6888
Fax: 905-509-0633
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Basement Unit 101, 10 Royal Orchard Boulevard, Thornhill, ON L3T 3C3, (905) 771-7600
Date Received: 16 May 2016


Address: Patients looking for medical records may write to the following address: 3930 14th Avenue P O Box 3006 Markham, ON L3R 6G4
Date Received: 15 Sep 2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN I-HSIANG LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996