Laidley, Ian Frederick (CPSO#: 90910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrance Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Juravinski Cancer and HSC
711 Concession Street
Brantford, ON
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: 905-522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Brant Community Healthcare System
Willett Urgent Care
238 Grand River St. N
Paris ON  N3L 2M2
Canada
Phone: 519-442-2251
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Laidley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Laidley ( CPSO# 90910 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Service Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
2nd Floor
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Brant Community Healthcare System,Willett Site Paris
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN FREDERICK LAIDLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIDLEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2015