Lajeunesse, Alain-Remi (CPSO#: 91591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0Z9
Phone: (613) 830-8388
Fax: (613) 830-8588
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alain-Remi Lajeunesse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lajeunesse ( CPSO# 91591 )

Business Address:
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K4A 0N9

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAIN-REMI LAJEUNESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAJEUNESSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 15 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011