Lakhani, Zubair (CPSO#: 77553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lakhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Lakhani ( CPSO# 77553 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
175 Stone Road West
Guelph ON  N1G 5L4
Phone Number: (519) 780-8585

Business Address:
103 - 105 Silvercreek Parkway
Guelph ON  N1H 6S4
Phone Number: (519) 822-9363

Business Address:
39 2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0G 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZUBAIR LAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004