Lalji, Sonia (CPSO#: 99518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: Sehgal, Sonia (used until: 02 Jun 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonia Lalji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lalji ( CPSO# 99518 )
Dr. J. Sehgal ( CPSO# 53431 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 576-1630

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONIA LALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALJI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014