Lalonde, Katelyn Emily (CPSO#: 87313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: Nickerson, Katelyn Emily (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katelyn Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lalonde ( CPSO# 87313 )

Business Address:
Arbour Family Medicine
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-1065

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATELYN EMILY LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 27 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009