Lalonde, Sebastien (CPSO#: 95397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Hand Surgery Center
East Wing - 2nd? F?loor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416 603 5340
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Lalonde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lalonde ( CPSO# 95397 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIEN LALONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LALONDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 09 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016